Global Patent Index - EP 1551642 B1

EP 1551642 B1 2007-10-10 - METHOD OF MAKING A LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR

Title (en)

METHOD OF MAKING A LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LITHOGRAPHISCHEN DRUCKPLATTENVORLÄUFERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PRECURSEUR DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 1551642 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03753595 A

Priority

  • EP 03753595 A
  • EP 0350623 W
  • EP 02102415 A
  • US 42029602 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004030925A1] A method of making a heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor is disclosed which comprises the steps of (i) providing a web of a lithographic support having a hydrophilic surface; (ii) applying on the hydrophilic surface of the web a coating comprising a phenolic resin; (iii) drying the coating; (iv) a heating step wherein the web temperature is maintained above the glass transition temperature of the phenolic resin Tg during a period of between 0.1 and 60 seconds; (v) a cooling step wherein the web temperature is reduced at an average cooling rate which is higher than if the web would be kept under ambient conditions but not higher than 30°C/s; (vi) winding the precursor on a core or cutting the precursor into sheets. The heating and the cooling step provide a significant improvement of the aging behavior of the precursor. A stable sensitivity is obtained shortly after coating.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/036 (2013.01); B41N 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004030925 A1 20040415; AU 2003271763 A1 20040423; CN 100439120 C 20081203; CN 1688451 A 20051026; DE 60316826 T2 20080717; EP 1551642 A1 20050713; EP 1551642 B1 20071010; JP 2006501507 A 20060112; JP 4338641 B2 20091007

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-14 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: AGFA NV; BE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-01-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE

- Document: DE 60316826

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60316826 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-01-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-01-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK