Global Patent Index - EP 1554281 A4

EP 1554281 A4 2009-02-25 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CERTAIN PYRROLOTRIAZINE COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PREPARING CERTAIN PYRROLOTRIAZINE COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BESTIMMTER PYRROLOTRIAZINVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CERTAINS COMPOSES DE PYRROLOTRIAZINE

Publication

EP 1554281 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03765846 A

Priority

  • US 0322755 W
  • US 39725602 P
  • US 44721303 P
  • US 62228003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004009542A2] The present invention relates to a process for preparing certain pyrrolotriazine compounds of the formula (I) and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof. The formula (I) compounds inhibit the tyrosine kinase activity of growth factor receptors such as VEGFR-2 and FGFR-1, thereby making them useful as anti-cancer agents. The formula I compounds are also useful for the treatment of other diseases associated with signal transduction pathways operating through growth factor receptors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 487/04; A61K 31/53; A61P 13/08; A61P 29/00; A61P 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/53 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2013.01); A61K 31/53 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/53 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004009542 A2 20040129; WO 2004009542 A3 20040513; AU 2003256645 A1 20040209; BR 0312648 A 20050802; CA 2492861 A1 20040129; CN 1665817 A 20050907; EP 1554281 A2 20050720; EP 1554281 A4 20090225; IL 165985 D0 20060115; JP 2006502120 A 20060119; MX PA05000344 A 20050331; PL 375316 A1 20051128; TW 200409776 A 20040616; TW I272271 B 20070201; US 2004077858 A1 20040422; US 6933386 B2 20050823

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1075253

2009-11-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090127

2005-12-09 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1075253

2005-07-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK