Global Patent Index - EP 1556020 B1

EP 1556020 B1 2009-02-25 - USE OF CGRP ANTAGONIST COMPOUNDS FOR TREATMENT OF PSORIASIS

Title (en)

USE OF CGRP ANTAGONIST COMPOUNDS FOR TREATMENT OF PSORIASIS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON CGRP-ANTAGONISTEN-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASIS

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE COMPOSES ANTAGONISTES DU CGRP POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU PSORIASIS

Publication

EP 1556020 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03784467 A

Priority

  • IS 0300023 W
  • IS 6496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004014351A2] The invention provides methods and compositions for treating, preventing and/ or remedying psoriasis, based on compounds that have a calcitonin-related gene peptide (CGRP) antagonistic effect. Methods are also disclosed for identifying compounds with CGRP antagonist activity which thereby are suitable candidate compounds for treating psoriasis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/166 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/727 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/225 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/166 (2013.01); A61K 31/506 (2013.01); A61K 31/517 (2013.01); A61K 31/727 (2013.01); A61K 38/482 (2013.01); C07K 16/26 (2013.01); G01N 33/5008 (2013.01); G01N 33/502 (2013.01); G01N 33/5044 (2013.01); G01N 33/5088 (2013.01); G01N 33/566 (2013.01); G01N 33/74 (2013.01); G01N 2333/5753 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004014351 A2 20040219; WO 2004014351 A3 20040617; AT 423553 T 20090315; AU 2003260944 A1 20040225; AU 2003260944 B2 20090514; BR 0313388 A 20050705; CA 2495498 A1 20040219; CA 2495498 C 20140415; CN 1674919 A 20050928; DE 60326370 D1 20090409; DK 1556020 T3 20090622; EA 008744 B1 20070831; EA 200500306 A1 20050825; EP 1556020 A2 20050727; EP 1556020 B1 20090225; ES 2323170 T3 20090708; IL 166761 A 20101230; IL 166761 D0 20060115; IS 2902 B 20141015; IS 7741 A 20050314; JP 2006501216 A 20060112; KR 101070213 B1 20111006; KR 20050056198 A 20050614; MX PA05001649 A 20050527; NO 20051262 A 20050311; NZ 538615 A 20080328; PL 375536 A1 20051128; PT 1556020 E 20090529; RS 20050132 A 20071115; RS 52750 B 20130830; SI 1556020 T1 20090831; US 2011150890 A1 20110623; US 2014220030 A1 20140807; US 9585940 B2 20170307

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170804

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170812

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-09-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-10-21 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 26 MAY 2009 ALLOWED ON 28 SEPTEMBER 2009

2009-09-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E005717

2009-08-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-08-17 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E003231

- Effective date: 20090522

2009-08-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BIRKIR SVEINSSON

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-08-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SVEINSSON, BIRKIR

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-07-29 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 26 MAY 2009

2009-07-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-07-27 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BIRKIR SVEINSSON, IS

- Effective date: 20090714

2009-07-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090618 AND 20090624

2009-07-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2323170 T3

2009-06-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-06-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-06-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SVEINSSON, BIRKIR

2009-06-17 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SVEINSSON, BIRKIR

2009-06-12 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090401388

2009-05-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2009-05-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BIRKIR SVEINSSON

- Free text: ACTAVIS GROUP HF.#REYKJAVIKURVEGI 76-78#220 HAFNARFJORDUR (IS) -TRANSFER TO- BIRKIR SVEINSSON#MIDSKOGUM 1#225 BESSASTADAHREPPUR (IS)

2009-05-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-05-25 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326370 P 20090409

2009-04-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/00 20060101AFI20080312BHEP

2008-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 17/06 20060101ALI20080312BHEP

2006-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACTAVIS GROUP HF.

2006-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SVEINSSON, BIRKIR

2005-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK