Global Patent Index - EP 1556188 B1

EP 1556188 B1 2009-02-18 - DUST COLLECTING CONTAINER FOR A HAND ELECTRIC MACHINE-TOOL

Title (en)

DUST COLLECTING CONTAINER FOR A HAND ELECTRIC MACHINE-TOOL

Title (de)

STAUBAUFFANGBEHÄLTER FÜR EINE ELEKTROHANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT DE COLLECTE DE POUSSIERE POUR MACHINE-OUTIL MANUELLE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1556188 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03809694 A

Priority

  • DE 0302240 W
  • DE 10249140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004039539A1] The invention relates to a dust-collecting container for a hand electric machine-tool, in particular for a portable electric grinder. The inventive dust container comprises a dust collecting chamber (17), an inlet connection (21), a dust removal hole (18) and a dust filter (20) disposed between the dust collecting chamber (17) and the dust removal hole (18). The aim of said invention is to develop a small dust container (14) which is not disturbing for the work with a portable electric grinder and ensures a high dust collecting efficiency. For this purpose, the inlet connection (21), the dust collecting chamber (17), the dust filter (20) and the dust removal hole (18) are arranged one above the other and the shape of the dust collecting container (14) is adapted to the external shape of the portable electric grinder.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004039539 A1 20040513; CN 100457395 C 20090204; CN 1688412 A 20051026; DE 10249140 A1 20040506; DE 50311200 D1 20090402; EP 1556188 A1 20050727; EP 1556188 B1 20090218; JP 2006503719 A 20060202; JP 4416659 B2 20100217; US 2005202767 A1 20050915; US 7553217 B2 20090630

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50311200 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-02-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR