Global Patent Index - EP 1557560 B1

EP 1557560 B1 2007-10-17 - Circuit for dynamic control of a power transistor in applications for high voltage

Title (en)

Circuit for dynamic control of a power transistor in applications for high voltage

Title (de)

Dynamische Steuerung eines Leistungstransistors bei Hochspannungsanwendungen

Title (fr)

Contrôle dynamique d'un transistor de puissance conçu pour les applications haute-tension

Publication

EP 1557560 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04425035 A

Priority

EP 04425035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1557560A1] The present invention relates to a circuit (20) for dynamic control of a power transistor in applications for high voltage and of the type wherein a power transistor (TR1) has a conduction terminal (C) connected to a load and a control terminal (G1) receiving a driving signal from a driver block (4) activated by a trigger signal (Vin) received on a circuit input terminal (IN1). Advantageously, the circuit (20) comprises a JFET component (TR2) inserted between the conduction (C) and control (G1) terminal of the power transistor (TR1) and equal to a resistance with non-linear feature. <??>Moreover, the JFET component (TR2) is monolithically integrated in the structure of said power transistor (TR1). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/055 (2006.01); F02P 3/04 (2006.01); H03K 17/082 (2006.01); H03K 17/567 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03K 17/0828 (2013.01); F02P 3/0435 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1557560 A1 20050727; EP 1557560 B1 20071017; DE 602004009524 D1 20071129; DE 602004009524 T2 20080731; US 2005184793 A1 20050825

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090122

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080122

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080122

2008-08-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009524 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060118

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK