Global Patent Index - EP 1561116 B9

EP 1561116 B9 2009-02-25 - SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PLGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES

Title (en)

SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PLGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES

Title (de)

SCD40L, PAPP-A UND PLAZENTALER-WACHSTUMSFAKTOR (PIGF) ALS BIOCHEMISCHE MARKERKOMBINATIONEN BEI KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

SCD40L ET FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE PLACENTAIRE (PIGF) SERVANT DE COMBINAISONS DE MARQUEURS BIOCHIMIQUES POUR DES MALADIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES

Publication

EP 1561116 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 03779880 A

Priority

  • DE 10253525 A
  • DE 10316059 A
  • EP 0312531 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004046722A2] The invention relates to novel markers of vascular inflammation and to combinations thereof that are used as diagnosis and prognosis tools in patients suffering from cardiovascular diseases. The markers also act as tools to facilitate the selection of active ingredients for treating diseases of this type and constitute the starting point for the treatment of cardiovascular diseases. The invention also relates to the creation of an individual risk profile of negative events, which are associated with the progression of arteriosclerosis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/68 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/6893 (2013.01); C07K 14/70575 (2013.01); G01N 2333/96486 (2013.01); G01N 2800/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004046722 A2 20040603; WO 2004046722 A3 20040826; AT 394679 T 20080515; AU 2003288027 A1 20040615; AU 2003288027 A8 20040615; CA 2509063 A1 20040603; CA 2509063 C 20101102; DE 50309809 D1 20080619; EP 1561116 A2 20050810; EP 1561116 B1 20080507; EP 1561116 B9 20090225; EP 1561116 B9 20090401; EP 1962096 A2 20080827; EP 1962096 A3 20080924; EP 1962096 A9 20081112; EP 1962096 B1 20120718; ES 2305541 T3 20081101; ES 2391313 T3 20121123; JP 2006508367 A 20060309; JP 4741249 B2 20110803; US 2007042438 A1 20070222; US 2013004487 A1 20130103; US 8409815 B2 20130402; US 8673581 B2 20140318

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2015-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2014-10-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2014-08-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2013-04-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2013-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-11-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080808

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2010-07-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081108

2010-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

2009-12-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2009-10-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-05-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

2009-04-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS PRODUCTS GMBH

2009-03-25 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PLGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES

2009-03-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090209

2009-02-27 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-02-27 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-01-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081007

2008-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS PRODUCTS GMBH

- Effective date: 20081015

2008-11-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS-HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS PRODUCTS GMBH

- Free text: DADE BEHRING MARBURG GMBH#EMIL-VON-BEHRING-STRASSE 76#35041 MARBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS-HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS PRODUCTS GMBH#GOERZHAEUSER HOF, EMIL-VON-BEHRING-STRASSE 76#35041 MARBURG (DE)

2008-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2305541 T3

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS PRODUCTS GMBH

2008-09-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2008-08-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50309809 P 20080619

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK