Global Patent Index - EP 1562705 A4

EP 1562705 A4 2007-04-25 - NEW CATALYST STRUCTURE FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION

Title (en)

NEW CATALYST STRUCTURE FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION

Title (de)

NEUE KATALYSATORSTRUKTUR ZUR DIEOLEFINPOLYMERISATION

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE STRUCTURE DE CATALYSEUR SERVANT A LA POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES

Publication

EP 1562705 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03779526 A

Priority

  • US 0336049 W
  • US 30188402 A
  • US 69206803 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004047972A2] Bridged catalyst component in which a bridge spans two cylcopentadienyl or aromatic groups. The Cp or aromatic groups are attached to the same or different heteroatoms of the bridge, which heteroatoms are also bonded to a metal. A catalyst system can be made by contacting the bridged component with a cocatalyst. Polymerization of olefins can be catalyzed by the system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/74 (2006.01); B01J 31/22 (2006.01); C07F 15/02 (2006.01); C07F 17/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/44 (2006.01); C08F 4/60 (2006.01); C08F 4/70 (2006.01); C08F 4/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/1815 (2013.01); B01J 23/74 (2013.01); C07F 15/025 (2013.01); C07F 17/02 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); B01J 31/1845 (2013.01); B01J 31/2204 (2013.01); B01J 2531/0258 (2013.01); B01J 2531/84 (2013.01); B01J 2531/842 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/80
  2. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/7042
  3. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/7054
  4. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/7068

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9830612 A1 19980716 - DU PONT [US], et al
  • [X] EP 1125928 A1 20010822 - IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]
  • [PX] WO 03011876 A1 20030213 - SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al
  • [PX] CN 1398836 A 20030226 - CHINESE ACAD INST CHEMISTRY [CN]
  • [X] BRITOVSEK G J P ET AL: "IRON AND COBALT ETHYLENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS BEARING 2,6-BIS(IMINO)PYRIDYL LIGANDS: SYNTHESIS, STRUCTURES, AND POLYMERIZATION STUDIES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 121, no. 38, 29 September 1999 (1999-09-29), pages 8728 - 8740, XP001025779, ISSN: 0002-7863
  • [X] BRITOVSEK G J P ET AL: "OLIGOMERISATION OF ETHYLENE BY BIS(IMINO)PYRIDYLIRON AND -COBALT COMPLEXES", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, VCH PUBLISHERS, US, vol. 6, no. 12, 2000, pages 2221 - 2231, XP000942739, ISSN: 0947-6539
  • [X] ZHI, MA ET AL.: "Ethylene polymerization by iron complexes with symmetrical and unsymmetrical ligands", POLYMER INTERNATIONAL, vol. 51, no. 10, 30 October 2002 (2002-10-30), pages 994 - 997, XP009080780
  • See also references of WO 2004047972A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004047972 A2 20040610; WO 2004047972 A3 20041209; AU 2003285202 A1 20040618; AU 2003285202 A8 20040618; CA 2503986 A1 20040610; EP 1562705 A2 20050817; EP 1562705 A4 20070425; JP 2006507345 A 20060302; JP 4977322 B2 20120718; KR 20050085108 A 20050829

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140603

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080716

2007-04-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070328

2006-03-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK