Global Patent Index - EP 1562978 A4

EP 1562978 A4 2007-10-10 - RAPID INDUCTION OF ALZHEIMER S AMYLOID PLAQUE FORMATION BY SULFATED GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANS

Title (en)

RAPID INDUCTION OF ALZHEIMER S AMYLOID PLAQUE FORMATION BY SULFATED GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANS

Title (de)

SCHNELLE INDUKTION VONALZHEIMER-AMYLOIDPLAQUEBILDUNG DURCH SULFATIERTE GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANE

Title (fr)

INDUCTION RAPIDE DE LA FORMATION DE LA PLAQUE AMYLOIDE D'ALZHEIMER PAR DES GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANES SULFATES

Publication

EP 1562978 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03778061 A

Priority

  • US 0334797 W
  • US 42318502 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004041779A2] A method of induction of amyloid plaques includes immobilizing a quantity of a selected sulfated glycosaminoglycan (SGAG) on a selected medium and adding to the immobilized SGAG on the medium a quantity of dissolved low fibrillar Aß 1-40 (LFAß). The LFAß is added preferably in a Aß:SGAG w/w ratio of about 1:1. SGAGs are preferably selected from heparin, heparan sulfate, keratan sulfate, dermatan sulfate, chondroitin-4-sulfate and chondroitin-6-sulfate. Screening methods and kits for screening either immobilize a quantity of a selected sulfated glycosaminoglycan (SGAG) on a selected medium, followed by adding to a quantity of dissolved low fibrillar Aß 1-40 (LFAß) a selected quantity of the selected amyloid therapeutic candidate to create a test solution, and then adding to the immobilized SGAG on the medium a selected quantity of the test solution to test for inhibition, or preform amyloid plaques on the medium by immobilizing a quantity of a selected sulfated glycosaminoglycan (SLAG) or a GAG-related macromolecule on a selected medium and then adding a selected quantity of dissolved low fibrillar Aß 1-40 (LFAß), followed by adding to the amyloid plaques on the medium a selected quantity of a test solution of a selected amyloid therapeutic candidate to test for disruption.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/00; C07K 14/00; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4711 (2013.01); G01N 33/6896 (2013.01); G01N 2400/40 (2013.01); G01N 2500/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004041779 A2 20040521; WO 2004041779 A3 20050113; AU 2003286845 A1 20040607; AU 2003286845 A8 20040607; CA 2504035 A1 20040521; EP 1562978 A2 20050817; EP 1562978 A4 20071010; JP 2006507488 A 20060302; JP 4469281 B2 20100526

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091110

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080205

2007-10-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070906

2006-02-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK