Global Patent Index - EP 1564749 B8

EP 1564749 B8 2009-02-18 - Multi-port memory based on DRAM core

Title (en)

Multi-port memory based on DRAM core

Title (de)

Multiportspeicher auf Basis von DRAM

Title (fr)

Mémoire multiportes basée sur une DRAM

Publication

EP 1564749 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 05010996 A

Priority

  • EP 01308424 A
  • JP 2000387891 A
  • JP 2000398893 A
  • JP 2000399052 A
  • JP 2001034361 A
  • JP 2001037547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002078311A1] A semiconductor memory device includes a plurality of N external ports, each of which receives commands, and an internal circuit which performs at least N access operations during a minimum interval of the commands that are input into one of the external ports.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 8/16 (2006.01); G11C 11/4096 (2006.01); G11C 7/10 (2006.01); G11C 7/22 (2006.01); G11C 11/409 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 7/1051 (2013.01); G11C 7/1039 (2013.01); G11C 7/1075 (2013.01); G11C 7/1078 (2013.01); G11C 7/22 (2013.01); G11C 8/16 (2013.01); G11C 11/406 (2013.01); G11C 11/40603 (2013.01); G11C 11/40615 (2013.01); G11C 11/40618 (2013.01); G11C 11/409 (2013.01); G11C 2207/107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1220226 A2 20020703; EP 1220226 A3 20021218; EP 1220226 B1 20050817; CN 1271636 C 20060823; CN 1360314 A 20020724; DE 60112701 D1 20050922; DE 60112701 T2 20060518; DE 60132382 D1 20080221; DE 60132382 T2 20080724; DE 60136574 D1 20081224; DE 60142756 D1 20100916; EP 1564748 A2 20050817; EP 1564748 A3 20060329; EP 1564748 B1 20080109; EP 1564749 A2 20050817; EP 1564749 A3 20060329; EP 1564749 B1 20081112; EP 1564749 B8 20090218; EP 1808861 A1 20070718; EP 1808861 B1 20100804; KR 100801119 B1 20080205; KR 20020050092 A 20020626; TW 526500 B 20030401; US 2002078311 A1 20020620

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SOCIONEXT INC., YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FUJITSU SEMICONDUCTOR LTD., YOKOHAMA, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 60136574

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136574

- Representative's name: REICHERT & LINDNER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-05-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136574

- Representative's name: REICHERT & LINDNER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-01-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUJITSU MICROELECTRONICS LIMITED

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136574 P 20081224

2008-12-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-11-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1220226 P

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-08-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1220226 P

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB