Global Patent Index - EP 1565488 A4

EP 1565488 A4 2007-10-03 - CANCER-LINKED GENE AS TARGET FOR CHEMOTHERAPY

Title (en)

CANCER-LINKED GENE AS TARGET FOR CHEMOTHERAPY

Title (de)

MIT KREBS IN VERBINDUNG GEBRACHTES GEN ALS ZIEL FÜR DIE CHEMOTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

GENE LIE AU CANCER SERVANT DE CIBLE POUR LA CHIMIOTHERAPIE

Publication

EP 1565488 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03753063 A

Priority

  • US 0315490 W
  • US 38075202 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03097807A2] Cancer-linked gene sequences, and derived amino acid sequences, are disclosed along with processes for assaying potential antitumor agents based on their modulation of the expression of these cancer-linked genes. Also disclosed are antibodies that react with the disclosed polypeptides and methods of using the antibodies to treat cancerous conditions, such as by using the antibody to target cancerous cells in vivo for purposes of delivering therapeutic agents thereto. Also described are methods of diagnosing using the gene sequences.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/00; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/00; C12Q 1/68; C12Q 1/70; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/543; G01N 33/577

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/82 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57419 (2013.01); C07K 14/82 (2013.01); G01N 33/57446 (2013.01); G01N 33/6893 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03097807 A2 20031127; WO 03097807 A3 20050630; AU 2003248528 A1 20031202; AU 2003248528 A8 20031202; CA 2486060 A1 20031127; EP 1565488 A2 20050824; EP 1565488 A4 20071003; US 2006110731 A1 20060525

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090302

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080218

2007-10-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070904

2005-09-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-08-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041125

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK