Global Patent Index - EP 1566225 A3

EP 1566225 A3 2009-02-25 - Apparatus for bonding two substrate surfaces in an optically appealing way

Title (en)

Apparatus for bonding two substrate surfaces in an optically appealing way

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur optisch ansprechenden Verklebung zweier Substratflächen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de collage de deux surfaces de substrats de manière esthétique

Publication

EP 1566225 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05001878 A

Priority

DE 202004002834 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1566225A2] During coating with adhesive, the distance between the nozzle exit and substrate surface (101-104) is small enough for the adhesive coating (105) to be applied in a semi-contact or contact-mode. In semi-contact mode the distance between the nozzle exit and substrate surface is less than the diameter of the drop or bead resulting from the adhesive viscosity and/or surface tension and the size of the nozzle exit. In contact mode the substrate is in direct contact with the edge of the nozzle exit and forcing adhesive out of the nozzle reduces the distance between the edge of the nozzle exit and the substrate surface. A means is provided for moving the two substrates (100) relative to at least one adhesive applicator nozzle (120). A means is provided for supplying reactive adhesive to the nozzle. A means is provided for applying the adhesive from the nozzle onto the substrate surface. A means is provided for pressing the two substrate surfaces together.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/10 (2006.01); B05C 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0275 (2013.01); B05C 5/0245 (2013.01); B05C 5/0237 (2013.01); B05C 9/10 (2013.01); B05C 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202004002834 U1 20040609; EP 1566225 A2 20050824; EP 1566225 A3 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130221

2012-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 5/02 20060101ALI20120810BHEP

2012-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 5/00 20060101AFI20120810BHEP

2009-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091120

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU