Global Patent Index - EP 1567860 A4

EP 1567860 A4 20060510 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR EXAMINING PATHWAYS ASSOCIATED WITH GLIOBLASTOMA PROGRESSION

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR EXAMINING PATHWAYS ASSOCIATED WITH GLIOBLASTOMA PROGRESSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG VON MIT GLIOBLASTOMPROGRESSION ASSOZIIERTEN WEGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES, SUBSTANCES ET MATERIEL PERMETTANT D'EXAMINER DES VOIES ASSOCIEES A LA PROGRESSION DE GLIOBLASTOME

Publication

EP 1567860 A4 20060510 (EN)

Application

EP 03768629 A 20031105

Priority

  • US 0335115 W 20031105
  • US 42377702 P 20021105

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004044218A2] The invention disclosed herein provides methods for the examination and/or quantification of biochemical pathways that are disregulated in pathologies such as cancer and to reagents and kits adapted for performing such methods.

IPC 1-7

G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level

C12Q (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

G01N 33/574 (2013.01); G01N 33/5748 (2013.01); G01N 33/57488 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9902704 A2 19990121 - COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 03087761 A2 20031023 - CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al
  • [A] GRÜNWALD VIKTOR ET AL: "Inhibitors of mTOR reverse doxorubicin resistance conferred by PTEN status in prostate cancer cells.", CANCER RESEARCH. 1 NOV 2002, vol. 62, no. 21, 1 November 2002 (2002-11-01), pages 6141 - 6145, XP002359273, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • [A] SHI Y ET AL: "Enhanced sensitivity of multiple myeloma cells containing PTEN mutations to CCI-779", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 62, no. 17, 1 September 2002 (2002-09-01), pages 5027 - 5034, XP002323911, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • [A] LI J ET AL: "PTEN, a putative protein tyrosine phosphatase gene mutated in human brain, breast, and prostate cancer.", SCIENCE. 28 MAR 1997, vol. 275, no. 5308, 28 March 1997 (1997-03-28), pages 1943 - 1947, XP002359327, ISSN: 0036-8075
  • [A] STAAL F J T ET AL: "A novel germline mutation of PTEN associated with brain tumours of multiple lineages.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER. 20 MAY 2002, vol. 86, no. 10, 20 May 2002 (2002-05-20), pages 1586 - 1591, XP002359328, ISSN: 0007-0920
  • See also references of WO 2004044218A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2004044218 A2 20040527; WO 2004044218 A3 20041202; AU 2003291736 A1 20040603; AU 2003291736 A8 20040603; CA 2504042 A1 20040527; DE 03768629 T1 20060126; EP 1567860 A2 20050831; EP 1567860 A4 20060510; ES 2245619 T1 20060116; JP 2006505793 A 20060216; JP 2009115817 A 20090528; US 2004106141 A1 20040603

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 0335115 W 20031105; AU 2003291736 A 20031105; CA 2504042 A 20031105; DE 03768629 T 20031105; EP 03768629 A 20031105; ES 03768629 T 20031105; JP 2004551714 A 20031105; JP 2009006420 A 20090115; US 70149003 A 20031105