Global Patent Index - EP 1568794 B1

EP 1568794 B1 2009-02-04 - Ni-BASE SINGLE CRYSTAL SUPERALLOY

Title (en)

Ni-BASE SINGLE CRYSTAL SUPERALLOY

Title (de)

MONOKRISTALLINE NICKEL-BASIS-SUPERLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

SUPERALLIAGE A CRISTAL UNIQUE A BASE DE NI

Publication

EP 1568794 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03777308 A

Priority

  • JP 0315619 W
  • JP 2002355756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1568794A1] The object of the present invention is to provide an Ni-based single crystal super alloy capable of improving strength by preventing precipitation of a TCP phase at high temperatures. This object is achieved by an Ni-based single crystal super alloy having a composition comprising 5.0-7.0 wt% of Al, 4.0-10.0 wt% of Ta, 1.1-4.5 wt% of Mo, 4.0-10.0 wt% of W, 3.1-8.0 wt% of Re, 0-0.50 wt% of Hf, 2.0-5.0 wt% of Cr, 0-9.9 wt% of Co and 4.1-14.0 wt% of Ru in terms of its weight ratio, with the remainder consisting of Ni and unavoidable impurities.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1568794 A1 20050831; EP 1568794 A4 20061102; EP 1568794 B1 20090204; AU 2003289214 A1 20040630; AU 2003289214 A8 20040630; CA 2508698 A1 20040624; CA 2508698 C 20120515; CN 100357467 C 20071226; CN 1745186 A 20060308; DE 60326083 D1 20090319; JP 3814662 B2 20060830; JP WO2004053177 A1 20060413; US 2006011271 A1 20060119; WO 2004053177 A1 20040624

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326083 P 20090319

2009-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATIVE INSTITUTION NATIONAL IN

2007-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IHI CORPORATION

2007-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070214

2006-11-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-03-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-03-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOBAYASHI, TOSHIHARU NAT. INS. FOR MAT. SCIENCE

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOIZUMI, YUTAKA, NAT. INST. FOR MAT. SCIENCE

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOKOKAWA, TADAHARU, NAT. INST. FOR MAT. SCIENCE

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARADA, HIROSHI, NAT. INST. FOR MAT. SCIENCE

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AOKI, YASUHIRO, ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA HEAVY IND. CO.

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ARAI, MIKIYA, ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA HEAVY IND. CO.

2006-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASAKI, SHOJU, ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA HEAVY IND. CO.

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATIVE INSTITUTION NATIONALINS

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA HEAVY INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.

2005-08-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK