Global Patent Index - EP 1571113 A4

EP 1571113 A4 2009-02-25 - ELEVATOR EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

ELEVATOR EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

AUFZUGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1571113 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02808099 A

Priority

JP 0211614 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1571113A1] In an elevator apparatus, a pair of supporting beams are secured at a distance from each other in an upper portion inside a hoistway. A machine base for supporting a driving machine and a deflection sheave is secured on the supporting beams. The driving machine is disposed on a lower portion of the machine base so as to be positioned between the supporting beams. A main rope is wound around a drive sheave and the deflection sheave by a double-wrap method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1571113 A1 20050907; EP 1571113 A4 20090225; EP 1571113 B1 20101027; DE 60238146 D1 20101209; JP WO2004041703 A1 20060309; KR 20040068178 A 20040730; WO 2004041703 A1 20040521

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60238146

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60238146

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60238146

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-02-09 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60238146 P 20101209

2010-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090126

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2006-03-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-03-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2005-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040428

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-09-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI