EP 1571619 A1 20050907 - Gaming machine
Title (en)
Gaming machine
Title (de)
Spielgerät
Title (fr)
Machine de jeu
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 04004703 A 20040301
Abstract (en)
The gaming machine has the game result display means for displaying a result concerning with a game and beneficial state generating means for generating a beneficial state for a player when a specific game result is displayed on the game result display means, wherein the game result display means includes first display means and second display means arranged at a more front side than a display area of the first display means when seen from a front side of the gaming machine, and the second display means has a symbol display area (21L, 21C, 21R) capable of transmittably displaying a display result of the first display means (3L, 3C, 3R) therethrough. Further, the gaming machine has display control means for controlling the second display means so as to display game information (21a) in an area including the symbol display area. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G07F 17/32 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G07F 17/3211 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2003087690 A1 20030508 - LOOSE TIMOTHY C [US], et al
- [X] GB 2165074 A 19860403 - JPM
- [X] EP 0410789 A2 19910130 - UNIVERSAL KK [JP]
- [X] EP 0887775 A1 19981230 - UNIVERSAL SALES CO LTD [JP]
- [X] US 2001031658 A1 20011018 - OZAKI MASAAKI [JP], et al
- [X] US 2002077172 A1 20020620 - UCHIYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al
- [A] US 4562433 A 19851231 - BIFERNO MICHAEL A [US]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 09 31 July 1998 (1998-07-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 26 1 July 2002 (2002-07-01)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 08 5 August 2002 (2002-08-05)
Citation (examination)
US 2002047968 A1 20020425 - YOSHIDA KEISUKE [JP], et al
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04004703 A 20040301