Global Patent Index - EP 1573766 B1

EP 1573766 B1 2009-02-25 - ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER ANTRIEB

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1573766 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03785595 A

Priority

  • DE 0304205 W
  • DE 10261811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004057637A1] According to the invention, an electromagnetic actuator (1) for a switch, operating in the medium voltage range, comprising at least one magnet body (2, 3), defining an air gap, a moving body (5), arranged in the air gap (4), guided to move relative to the magnet body (2, 3), at least one permanent magnet and at least one conductor (6), through which a current may flow, whereby the conductor(s) (6) extend(s) at least partly into a magnetic field generated by the permanent magnets on a movement of the moving body (5), may be produced such as to be able to be fixed in the end positions thereof in a simple manner, whereby the moving body (5) is fixed to at least one soft-magnetic locking body (7) and the magnetic field generated by the permanent magnet(s) (3) flows through the locking body (7) in an end position of the moving body (5) in which the air gap (4) for the magnetic field is bridged by the locking body (7).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01F 7/06 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/122 (2006.01); H01F 7/14 (2006.01); H01H 53/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6662 (2013.01); H01F 7/066 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01); H01F 7/122 (2013.01); H01F 7/145 (2013.01); H01H 53/015 (2013.01); H01H 2003/268 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004057637 A1 20040708; CN 100334670 C 20070829; CN 1729548 A 20060201; DE 10261811 A1 20040715; DE 10261811 B4 20050120; DE 50311231 D1 20090409; EP 1573766 A1 20050914; EP 1573766 B1 20090225; JP 2006511047 A 20060330; RU 2005122646 A 20060210; RU 2322724 C2 20080420; US 2006049901 A1 20060309

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50311231 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-04-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR