Global Patent Index - EP 1575013 A3

EP 1575013 A3 2007-10-31 - Sensor with multiplex-data output

Title (en)

Sensor with multiplex-data output

Title (de)

Sensor mit Multiplex-Datenausgang

Title (fr)

Capteur avec une sortie pour sortir des données par multiplexage

Publication

EP 1575013 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04030561 A

Priority

DE 102004007486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1575013A2] An original word is divided into separate short words, after which the short words are converted into corresponding analog false signals that are in turn transmitted to the signal input portion of a receiver. The signals are in turn converted into short words, of which the number of bits is determined by the bit number of the short words to which the sensor corresponds. The resulting short word is then coupled with the data word at the receiving side which is in the exact sequence as that of the short word. An independent claim is also included for a sensor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 15/00 (2006.01); G08C 19/00 (2006.01); G08C 15/08 (2006.01); H04L 5/02 (2006.01); H04L 5/04 (2006.01); H04N 5/228 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1575013 A2 20050914; EP 1575013 A3 20071031; EP 1575013 B1 20100224; DE 102004007486 A1 20051027; DE 502004010803 D1 20100408; JP 2005228336 A 20050825; JP 4745679 B2 20110810; KR 101089486 B1 20111202; KR 20060041930 A 20060512; US 2005243184 A1 20051103; US 7319418 B2 20080115

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TDK-MICRONAS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICRONAS GMBH, 79108 FREIBURG, DE

- Document: DE 502004010803

2017-03-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004010803

- Representative's name: KOCH-MUELLER PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2011-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101125

2010-05-19 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004010803 P 20100408

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2010-02-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2008-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080502

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU