Global Patent Index - EP 1575207 B8

EP 1575207 B8 2009-02-18 - Method and device for providing timing information in a wireless communication system

Title (en)

Method and device for providing timing information in a wireless communication system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Taktinformation in einem drahtlosen Nachrichtenübertragungsnetzwerk

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour mettre à disposition de l'information de synchronisation dans un réseau de communication sans fil

Publication

EP 1575207 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 05012900 A

Priority

  • EP 05012900 A
  • EP 02754578 A
  • EP 01115679 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1274193A1] A method and a device of providing timing information within a wireless communication system is described. The timing information is extracted from a received transmit signal. The inventive method comprises the steps of providing a training signal on the receiver side relating to a known signal portion of the transmit signal, scaling the training signal, quantizing the scaled training signal, correlating one or more parts of the received transmit signal with the scaled training signal to obtain one or more correlation results, and determining the timing information on the basis of the correlation results. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 11/00 (2006.01); H04L 7/04 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04L 7/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 7/042 (2013.01); H04L 7/04 (2013.01); H04L 27/2613 (2013.01); H04W 56/0085 (2013.01); H04L 7/007 (2013.01); H04L 27/2662 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1274193 A1 20030108; AT 312444 T 20051215; AT 377880 T 20071115; AT 415023 T 20081215; CN 1294717 C 20070110; CN 1522515 A 20040818; DE 60207860 D1 20060112; DE 60207860 T2 20060817; DE 60223422 D1 20071220; DE 60223422 T2 20080821; DE 60229984 D1 20090102; EP 1402677 A1 20040331; EP 1402677 B1 20051207; EP 1575207 A2 20050914; EP 1575207 A3 20060315; EP 1575207 B1 20081119; EP 1575207 B8 20090218; EP 1575208 A2 20050914; EP 1575208 A3 20060301; EP 1575208 B1 20071107; ES 2250682 T3 20060416; ES 2293423 T3 20080316; ES 2313153 T3 20090301; JP 2004534478 A 20041111; JP 4202912 B2 20081224; TW 574794 B 20040201; US 2004180666 A1 20040916; US 2009034667 A1 20090205; US 2009052598 A1 20090226; US 7327817 B2 20080205; US 7729460 B2 20100601; US 7760834 B2 20100720; WO 03005633 A1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160523

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160522

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160522

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60229984

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090220

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-06 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

2009-10-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-05-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2313153 T3

2009-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60229984 P 20090102

2008-12-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2008-12-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1402677 P

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 7/04 20060101AFI20080509BHEP

2008-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 27/26 20060101ALI20080509BHEP

2008-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04B 7/26 20060101ALI20080509BHEP

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070413

2006-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WENGER, FABIAN

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DETTMAR, UWE

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WACHSMANN, UDO

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHRAMM, PETER

2005-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-09-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1402677 P

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR