Global Patent Index - EP 1577613 A3

EP 1577613 A3 2009-02-11 - Lamp for lighting device

Title (en)

Lamp for lighting device

Title (de)

Leuchtmittel für eine Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Lampe pour dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 1577613 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05005190 A

Priority

DE 102004011974 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1577613A2] Light source (1) for lamp contains housing (2) with at least one LED (3) on cooling member, e.g. cooling pin (4), coupled to housing. Preferably. light source is suitable for use in halogen lamps, and cooling pin is integral part of housing. Cooling pin, or protrusion, may be alternatively coupled to housing via heat conducting ribs (5) and housing may comprise external cooling ribs (6), typically located in longitudinal direction of light source. Heat conducting paste (7) may be applied to LED facing side of pin.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 29/00 (2006.01); F21K 99/00 (2010.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 29/004 (2013.01); F21K 9/23 (2016.08); F21V 29/74 (2013.01); F21V 29/773 (2013.01); F21V 29/80 (2013.01); F21V 29/89 (2013.01); F21V 19/0005 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1577613 A2 20050921; EP 1577613 A3 20090211; DE 102004011974 A1 20050922

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU