Global Patent Index - EP 1580421 A1

EP 1580421 A1 20050928 - Device for mixing exhaust gases to be recirculated to an engine with the intake air and a method for recirculating exhaust gases

Title (en)

Device for mixing exhaust gases to be recirculated to an engine with the intake air and a method for recirculating exhaust gases

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Beimischen von rückgeführtem Abgas zur Ansaugluft eines Motors und Verfahren zur Abgasrückführung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour mélanger les gas d'échappement recyclés à l'air d'admission d'un moteur et procédé pour recycler les gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1580421 A1 20050928 (EN)

Application

EP 05102243 A 20050321

Priority

IT MI20040564 A 20040323

Abstract (en)

Device for introducing exhaust gases recirculated from an internal combustion engine into the intake air supplied to such engine, in which the exhaust gas is divided into several flows that are introduced perpendicularly, through specific channels (3, 3'), into the intake air flow, preferably downstream of an elbow (8) on a duct (1) for such air.Method for recirculating exhaust gases in an internal combustion engine, in which such gases are introduced into the intake air by means of a device as described above, upstream of the intake manifold of the engine.

IPC 1-7

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level

F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

F02M 26/12 (2016.02); F02M 26/19 (2016.02); F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/10222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] DE 3511094 A1 19861009 - DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]
  • [XA] EP 1004767 A2 20000531 - NISSAN MOTOR [JP]
  • [XA] EP 1264981 A1 20021211 - HOLSET ENGINEERING CO [GB]
  • [XA] US 4119071 A 19781010 - HATTORI KYO
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 02 2 April 2002 (2002-04-02)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 04 31 August 2000 (2000-08-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 120 (M - 685) 14 April 1988 (1988-04-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1580421 A1 20050928; EP 1580421 B1 20080618; EP 1580421 B2 20120704; AT 398728 T 20080715; DE 602005007528 D1 20080731; ES 2307109 T3 20081116; ES 2307109 T5 20121228; IT MI20040564 A1 20040623

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 05102243 A 20050321; AT 05102243 T 20050321; DE 602005007528 T 20050321; ES 05102243 T 20050321; IT MI20040564 A 20040323