Global Patent Index - EP 1584365 B1

EP 1584365 B1 2007-10-10 - TRANSMITTER FOR WIRELESS CONTROL

Title (en)

TRANSMITTER FOR WIRELESS CONTROL

Title (de)

SENDER FÜR DRAHTLOSE STEUERUNG

Title (fr)

EMETTEUR POUR COMMANDE SANS FIL

Publication

EP 1584365 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03701777 A

Priority

JP 0300382 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1584365A1] To provide a radio control transmitter that generates and transmits a control signal controlling a travelling direction of a toy vehicle, the radio control transmitter comprises: a supporter provided with a bearing section which is spherically recessed at the upper part; a lower case wherein the supporter protrudes through an inner center base; an opening section of an upper case formed at the center wherein the supporter penetrates through; a substrate positioned inside the lower case and perpendicular to the supporter; a plurality of switches which are fixed around a substrate opening section opened on the substrate, and which determine the travelling direction of the toy vehicle; and a control shaft which maintains a plurality of pressing sections positioned on each of the switches, comprising a spherical end axis section which is rotably fixed to the bearing section at the lower part of the control shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 30/04 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01); B24B 37/04 (2012.01); B24B 57/02 (2006.01); G05G 9/047 (2006.01); H05K 3/46 (2006.01); B01F 5/10 (2006.01); H05K 1/03 (2006.01); H05K 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0412 (2013.01); A63H 30/04 (2013.01); B24B 37/04 (2013.01); B24B 57/02 (2013.01); G05G 9/047 (2013.01); B01F 5/10 (2013.01); G05G 2009/04744 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1584365 A1 20051012; EP 1584365 A4 20070214; EP 1584365 B1 20071010; CN 1713941 A 20051228; DE 60316844 D1 20071122; DE 60316844 T2 20080131; JP WO2004064965 A1 20060518; US 2006148374 A1 20060706; WO 2004064965 A1 20040805

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60316844 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-05-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-10-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050715

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR