EP 1584593 A1 20051012 - Unwinding apparatus for reeling off coiled material
Title (en)
Unwinding apparatus for reeling off coiled material
Title (de)
Abrollvorrichtung für Ringbunde
Title (fr)
Dévidoir pour matériau enroulé
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102004016658 A 20040405
Abstract (en)
The rolling-out device for cables etc on spools has several arms (2, 2', 3, 3') spaced out from each other in a certain plane. At least one of these arms is fastened so that it can be turned in the said plane. At least one arm has a turning centering mandrel, so that it can be brought to a transporting position parallel to the arm.
Abstract (de)
Die Erfindung betrifft eine Abrollvorrichtung für Ringbunde mit mehreren radial in einer Ebene abstehenden Armen (2, 2', 3, 3'), wobei mindestens ein Arm (2, 2') in der genannten Ebene schwenkbar befestigt ist, und an mindestens einem Arm (2, 2', 3, 3') ein Zentrierdorn (9) schwenkbar anordnet ist, so dass er in eine Transportstellung parallel zum Arm gebracht werden kann. Gemäß einer Weiterbildung der Erfindung können die Arme (2, 2', 3, 3') teleskopierbar sein. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B65H 49/28 (2006.01); B65H 49/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B65H 49/30 (2013.01 - EP US); B65H 49/305 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2057728 A 19361020 - LESTER ELDREDGE A
- [A] DE 4223635 A1 19940120 - PVG PATENTVERWERTUNG [DE]
- [A] US 4949909 A 19900821 - HATFIELD STEVEN D [US]
- [A] US 3058688 A 19621016 - ABEL BARRY D
- [A] US 2463192 A 19490301 - MACKEY WILLIAM H, et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 05 12 May 2003 (2003-05-12)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 07 3 July 2002 (2002-07-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 370 (M - 1444) 13 July 1993 (1993-07-13)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1584593 A1 20051012; EP 1584593 B1 20100127; AT E456534 T1 20100215; DE 102004016658 A1 20051027; DE 502005008935 D1 20100318; DK 1584593 T3 20100531; US 2005253015 A1 20051117; US 7448570 B2 20081111
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05102574 A 20050401; AT 05102574 T 20050401; DE 102004016658 A 20040405; DE 502005008935 T 20050401; DK 05102574 T 20050401; US 9644405 A 20050401