Global Patent Index - EP 1586807 B1

EP 1586807 B1 2013-09-25 - The composite tank and the technology of its manufacturing

Title (en)

The composite tank and the technology of its manufacturing

Title (de)

Behälter aus Verbundwerkstoff und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Réservoir en matériau composite et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1586807 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04078026 A

Priority

PL 36717504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1586807A2] The invention solves the issue of the composite tank and the way of its manufacturing. It is peculiar because it has the liner (1) with the collar consisting of two parts (4). The internal part (3) has the external surface (8) to connect with the neck (2) of the liner (1) and a fragment of the segment (9) to connect with the external part (7). The neck (2) of the liner is internal. The collar (4) is covered jointly with the liner (1) by layers (14) of the composite material - glass fiber and carbon fiber. The way of manufacturing of the composite container, according to the invention involves the fact that after manufacturing of the elements of the neck, molding and joint manufacturing of the liner with the internal part of the collar takes place; then, after the assembly of the external part of the collar, the assembled tank is covered with the layers of the composite material - carbon fiber. The outer layers of the container are made of glass fiber.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/16 (2006.01); F17C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/16 (2013.01); F17C 1/06 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2201/056 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0604 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0619 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0624 (2013.01); F17C 2203/066 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0663 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0305 (2013.01); F17C 2260/011 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0745 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CZ DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1586807 A2 20051019; EP 1586807 A3 20110406; EP 1586807 B1 20130925; PL 203938 B1 20091130; PL 367175 A1 20051017

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131102

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 633860 T

- Effective date: 20131102

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131225

2014-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140626

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130925

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130925

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004043402

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131225

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-11-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602004043402

- Effective date: 20131121

2013-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 633860 T

- Effective date: 20131015

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE FR GB IT

2013-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-09-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE FR GB IT

2013-05-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130418

2012-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120402

2011-12-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110929

2011-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU

2011-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F17C 1/16 20060101AFI20050224BHEP

2011-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F17C 1/06 20060101ALI20110225BHEP

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-10-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU