Global Patent Index - EP 1589244 B1

EP 1589244 B1 2007-10-03 - Driving unit with axially preloaded driving disc

Title (en)

Driving unit with axially preloaded driving disc

Title (de)

Mitnehmereinheit mit axial vorgespannter Mitnehmerscheibe

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement avec plateau d'entraînement préchargé axiallement

Publication

EP 1589244 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04009398 A

Priority

EP 04009398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1589244A1] The unit (1) is assembled of a clutch disk (3) and a carrying element (2) both provided with complementary shaped toothed outer edges (7, 8). A corrugated circular spring element (11, 12) is inserted between both components (2, 3), accommodated inside a groove (13). The frictional forces created by the pressure between the three elements (2, 3, 11) prevent a relative motion of the parts. There could also be several spring elements (11) distributed around the disk (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 13/64 (2006.01); F16B 21/18 (2006.01); F16D 1/116 (2006.01); F16D 13/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 1/116 (2013.01); F16D 13/644 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1589244 A1 20051026; EP 1589244 B1 20071003; DE 502004005130 D1 20071115; EP 1738088 A1 20070103; JP 2007533930 A 20071122; KR 20070012482 A 20070125; US 2008011571 A1 20080117; WO 2005103519 A1 20051103

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-04-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005130 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060204

2005-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER INC.

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-10-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK