Global Patent Index - EP 1591399 A4

EP 1591399 A4 2009-02-25 - ELEVATOR EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

ELEVATOR EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1591399 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02807743 A

Priority

JP 0209624 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004026749A1] Elevator equipment, comprising a balance mechanism having a swing shaft extending horizontally and a balance body swingable about the swing shaft mounted in a car and a main rope body, the balance body further comprising a first rope connection part and a second rope connection part positioned on the opposite side of the first rope connection part with respect to the swing shaft, the main rope body further comprising a first main rope wound on a first drive sheave and a second main rope wound on a second drive sheave, the first main rope further comprising a first car side end part connected to the first rope connection part and a first counterweight side end part connected to a counterweight and the second main rope further comprising a second car side end part connected to the second rope connection part and a second counterweight side end part connected to the counterweight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/08 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/026 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1591399 A1 20051102; EP 1591399 A4 20090225; EP 1591399 B1 20100721; CN 1308215 C 20070404; CN 1589228 A 20050302; JP 4289623 B2 20090701; JP WO2004026749 A1 20060112; WO 2004026749 A1 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130810

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110426

2010-10-27 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): NL

2009-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090629

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090128

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2006-04-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-01-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): NL

2005-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040220

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR