Global Patent Index - EP 1592086 A3

EP 1592086 A3 2007-10-03 - Connection device with actuating mechanism

Title (en)

Connection device with actuating mechanism

Title (de)

Anschlussvorrichtung mit Betätigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement avec mécanisme d'actionnement

Publication

EP 1592086 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05101831 A

Priority

  • DE 202004013363 U
  • DE 202004006806 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1592086A2] The connector has a connector body (1) with an open- topped chamber (3), and a stationary electrical contact mounted in the chamber. The contact has an insulation severing unit, and an operating unit introduces an insulated conductor laterally into the chamber in insulation piercing relation with the severing unit. The operating unit has an operating component having a flexible section (15) that is guided along a curved path.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 43/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2433 (2013.01); H01R 43/015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202004013363 U1 20050908; EP 1592086 A2 20051102; EP 1592086 A3 20071003; US 2005245140 A1 20051103; US 7063557 B2 20060620

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150414

2010-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071102

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU