Global Patent Index - EP 1593498 A3

EP 1593498 A3 2009-02-25 - Device for driving a form dampening roller in rotary printing machines

Title (en)

Device for driving a form dampening roller in rotary printing machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Antrieb einer Feuchtauftragwalze in Rotations-Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement d'un rouleau toucheur de mouillage dans rotatives d'impression

Publication

EP 1593498 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05008876 A

Priority

DE 102004022889 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1593498A2] The drive device for the wetting mechanism (6) of the printing machine is connectable with the individual drive (9) which is assigned to the plate cylinder (1) and is synchronised with the drive wheel pulley (7). The drive for the wetting roller can be released from the drive wheel pulley through a switchable transmission for the second operating mode and then connected to the individual drive. The switchable transmission has a loose intermediate wheel on the plate cylinder drive shaft (11) meshing with a wheel of the drive wheel pulley.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2013.01); B41F 13/0008 (2013.01); B41F 13/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1593498 A2 20051109; EP 1593498 A3 20090225; EP 1593498 B1 20110323; DE 102004022889 A1 20060216; DE 502005011151 D1 20110505; US 2005247217 A1 20051110; US 7467586 B2 20081223

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160422

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160422

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160422

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502005011151

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-02-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111227

2011-05-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502005011151

- Effective date: 20110505

2011-05-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005011151 P 20110505

2011-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2011-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100127

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JENTZSCH, ARNDT

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIEGENBALG, CHRISTIAN

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIESE, MARTIN, DR.-ING.

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIRNSTEIN, BODO

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAULFUSS, ROGER

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU