Global Patent Index - EP 1593828 B1

EP 1593828 B1 2007-10-24 - Extendable control device

Title (en)

Extendable control device

Title (de)

Erweiterbares Steuergerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande élargible

Publication

EP 1593828 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05008451 A

Priority

DE 102004022614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1593828A1] Control unit comprises a micro-processor (2) having an interface (11) via which switches (9, 10) are coupled with an internal data bus (7). The switches are provided within the control unit on a circuit board with a voltage supply (14), a level converter (15-18), an extension storage unit (19) and a sensor/actuator interface (20). Preferred Features: A logic processing unit (21) is also provided for carrying out sensor signal processing, characterization field interpolation and Fourier transformation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/26 (2006.01); H04L 12/403 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/403 (2013.01); H04L 2012/40273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1593828 A1 20051109; EP 1593828 B1 20071024; DE 102004022614 B3 20060126; DE 502005001764 D1 20071206; US 2005278081 A1 20051215

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100419

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100419

2010-01-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 5

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005001764 P 20071206

2007-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2006-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-05-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: EXTENDABLE CONTROL DEVICE

2005-11-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU