Global Patent Index - EP 1593841 B1

EP 1593841 B1 2007-10-17 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 1593841 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05101642 A

Priority

DE 102004021921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1593841A1] An actuator and a hydraulic coupler are arranged in a valve housing (1). The hydraulic coupler includes a cylinder in which an axially movable coupler is arranged with a coupler gap between the piston and the cylinder. An adjusting device (42) is attached within an adjusting channel (43) of the valve housing, and acts on the hydraulic coupler to set a predetermined coupler gap.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 61/167 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 2200/703 (2013.01); F02M 2200/9007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1593841 A1 20051109; EP 1593841 B1 20071017; DE 102004021921 A1 20051201; DE 502005001701 D1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140303

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140303

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005001701

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005001701

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080123

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005001701 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060509

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU