Global Patent Index - EP 1596128 A3

EP 1596128 A3 2009-02-25 - Lighting device with self-shaping lampshades

Title (en)

Lighting device with self-shaping lampshades

Title (de)

Beleuchtungsvorrichtung mit selbstbildendem Lampenschirm

Title (fr)

Appareil d'éclairage avec abat-jour auto-formant

Publication

EP 1596128 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 05425296 A

Priority

IT VE20040018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1596128A2] In a lighting device (10) comprising (10) a support element (20), at least one seat (26) for a light (28) and at least one lampshade (40), the support element (20) is radially arranged with respect to said light seat (26). Moreover, the device (10) comprises coupling means (30c,30d) for the lampshade (40) to the support element (20), so as to cover and hide the seat (26), the light (28) and the support element (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/06 (2006.01); F21V 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/06 (2013.01); F21S 6/00 (2013.01); F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21S 8/06 (2013.01); F21V 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1596128 A2 20051116; EP 1596128 A3 20090225; IT VE20040018 A1 20040811

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-12-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2006-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAPUZZO, NICOLA

2006-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAPUZZO, ENRICO

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAPUZZO, NICOLA

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAPUZZO, ENRICO

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU