Global Patent Index - EP 1597061 A4

EP 1597061 A4 2007-10-31 - LABEL SHEET DESIGN FOR EASY REMOVAL OF LABELS

Title (en)

LABEL SHEET DESIGN FOR EASY REMOVAL OF LABELS

Title (de)

ETIKETTENBLATT FÜR LEICHTE ETIKETTENENTFERNUNG

Title (fr)

CONCEPTION DE FEUILLE D'ETIQUETTES PERMETTANT DE RETIRER FACILEMENT DES ETIQUETTES

Publication

EP 1597061 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03713742 A

Priority

US 0305996 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004078468A1] A label sheet (1) having a release liner (16) and a column of labels (12) releasably adhered thereto is modified to allow easy removal of the labels. The liner has a weakened separation line (30) formed by cuts and ties running underneath a column of labels near the edge of the labels, and notches (18) at the top and bottom of the sheet aligned with the cuts and ties. A matrix (14) surrounding the labels, if present, also has cuts and ties, with the cuts and ties in the matrix parallel to and slightly offset from the cuts and ties in the liner. The separation lines are strong enough that the label sheet can be fed through a printer, yet weak enough that a user can tear off the liner and matrix along the separation lines, thus leaving a minor edge of a column of labels exposed for easy removal from the label sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31D 1/02; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0288 (2013.01); G09F 3/02 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0201 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0222 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0225 (2013.01); G09F 2003/023 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0267 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004078468 A1 20040916; AU 2003217779 A1 20040928; AU 2003217779 B2 20081120; AU 2008243283 A1 20081204; AU 2008243283 B2 20110512; CA 2512250 A1 20040916; CA 2512250 C 20140211; CN 100504964 C 20090624; CN 1744987 A 20060308; DK 1597061 T3 20140811; EP 1597061 A1 20051123; EP 1597061 A4 20071031; EP 1597061 B1 20140507; EP 2277689 A1 20110126; EP 2277689 B1 20140507; ES 2489515 T3 20140902; JP 2006514335 A 20060427; JP 4029353 B2 20080109; MX PA05008849 A 20051018

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2017-05-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO

- Effective date: 20030228

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-12-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-10-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-05-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60346127

- Effective date: 20150210

2015-04-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150210

2015-03-25 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150316

2015-02-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60346127

2015-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-01-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-01-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CCL LABEL, INC., FRAMINGHAM, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AVERY DENNISON CORP., PASADENA, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60346127

- Effective date: 20141211

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CCL LABEL, INC., FRAMINGHAM, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AVERY DENNISON CORP., PASADENA, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60346127

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60346127

- Representative's name: MARKS & CLERK (LUXEMBOURG) LLP, LU

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60346127

- Representative's name: MARKS & CLERK (LUXEMBOURG) LLP, LU

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CCL LABEL, INC.

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140808

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-09-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 667198 T

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-09-10 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2014-09-02 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2489515 T3

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-08-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20140808

2014-06-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60346127

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-06-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2014-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 667198 T

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2014-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-10-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UTZ, MARTIN

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WONG, GALEN

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIRATHER, STEVEN, C.

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HODSDON, JERRY, G.

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACHNER, INGE

2013-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 3/10 20060101AFI20130109BHEP

2013-01-09 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60346127

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31D0001020000

- IPC: G09F0003100000

2012-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WONG, GALEN

2012-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIRATHER, STEVEN, C.

2012-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HODSDON, JERRY, G.

2012-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACHNER, INGE

2012-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UTZ, MARTIN

2008-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-10-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071004

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WONG, GALEN

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIRATHER, STEVEN, C.

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HODSDON, JERRY, G.

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACHNER, INGE

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UTZ, MARTIN

2006-06-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-11-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-11-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO