Global Patent Index - EP 1600517 B1

EP 1600517 B1 2009-02-18 - Lead-free, free-cutting copper alloys

Title (en)

Lead-free, free-cutting copper alloys

Title (de)

Bleifreie Automatenkupferlegierung

Title (fr)

Alliage de cuivre de décolletage sans plomb

Publication

EP 1600517 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05017191 A

Priority

  • EP 98953071 A
  • JP 28859098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1559802A1] Lead-free copper alloys with industrially satisfactory machinability comprising 69 to 79 percent, by weight, of copper, 2.0 to 4.0 percent, by weight, of silicon, and the remaining percent, by weight, of zinc. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 9/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/08 (2013.01); C22C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1559802 A1 20050803; EP 1559802 B1 20140115; AU 1054199 A 20000501; AU 744335 B2 20020221; CA 2314144 A1 20000420; CA 2314144 C 20060822; DE 69832097 D1 20051201; DE 69832097 T2 20060706; DE 69838115 D1 20070830; DE 69838115 T2 20080410; DE 69839830 D1 20080911; DE 69840585 D1 20090402; EP 1045041 A1 20001018; EP 1045041 A4 20030507; EP 1045041 B1 20051026; EP 1600515 A2 20051130; EP 1600515 A3 20051214; EP 1600515 B1 20080730; EP 1600515 B8 20081015; EP 1600516 A2 20051130; EP 1600516 A3 20051214; EP 1600516 B1 20070718; EP 1600517 A2 20051130; EP 1600517 A3 20051214; EP 1600517 B1 20090218; JP 2000119775 A 20000425; JP 3734372 B2 20060111; KR 20010033073 A 20010425; TW 421674 B 20010211; WO 0022182 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-05-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840585 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1045041 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI SHINDOH CO., LTD.

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT SE

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT SE

2005-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-11-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1045041 P

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT SE