Global Patent Index - EP 1603923 B9

EP 1603923 B9 2007-10-31 - METAL COMPLEXES

Title (en)

METAL COMPLEXES

Title (de)

METALLKOMPLEXE

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 1603923 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 04718627 A

Priority

  • EP 2004002393 W
  • DE 10310887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004081017A1] The invention relates to novel metal complexes. Said compounds are used as active components (= functional materials) in a series of different applications which can be attributed in the broadest sense to the electronics industry. The compounds according to the invention are described by structure 1 and formulae 1 to 82.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 1/12 (2006.01); C07D 213/30 (2006.01); C07D 217/16 (2006.01); C07F 5/00 (2006.01); C07F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/30 (2013.01); C07D 217/16 (2013.01); C07F 15/0033 (2013.01); C09B 57/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004081017 A1 20040923; CN 1759120 A 20060412; CN 1759120 B 20100428; DE 10310887 A1 20040930; DE 502004003964 D1 20070712; EP 1603923 A1 20051214; EP 1603923 B1 20070530; EP 1603923 B9 20071031; JP 2007524585 A 20070830; JP 5160782 B2 20130313; KR 101086655 B1 20111124; KR 20060002810 A 20060109; US 2006220004 A1 20061005; US 2010227978 A1 20100909; US 7728137 B2 20100601

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070829

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004003964 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STOESSEL, PHILIPP

2007-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPREITZER, HUBERT

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-06-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK PATENT GMBH

2006-06-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-12-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051011

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK