Global Patent Index - EP 1605550 B1

EP 1605550 B1 2007-10-17 - Matable electrical connectors having signal and power capabilities

Title (en)

Matable electrical connectors having signal and power capabilities

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussblöcke mit Signal- und Leistungseigenschaften

Title (fr)

Accouplement de connecteurs électriques ayant un signal et des capacités de puissance

Publication

EP 1605550 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05019128 A

Priority

  • EP 03028187 A
  • EP 99106269 A
  • US 8209198 P
  • US 16090098 A

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/16 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7088 (2013.01); H01R 12/727 (2013.01); H01R 13/113 (2013.01); H01R 13/432 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1605550 A1 20051214; EP 1605550 B1 20071017

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170410

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, VERSAILLES, FR

- Document: DE 69937378

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69937378

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-05-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080415

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-12-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937378 P 20071129

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1401055 P

2007-10-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0951102 P

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060811

2006-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2006-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLARK, STEPHEN L.

2006-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ORTEGA, JOSE L.

2006-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHUEY, JOSEPH B.

2006-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROWN III, JOHN B.

2005-12-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1401055 P

2005-12-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0951102 P

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE