Global Patent Index - EP 1606302 A4

EP 1606302 A4 2009-02-18 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USING SURAMIN, PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE, TELOMERASE ANTISENSE, AND TELOMERASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USING SURAMIN, PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE, TELOMERASE ANTISENSE, AND TELOMERASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON SURAMIN, PENTOSANPOLYSULFAT, TELOMERASE-ANTISENSE UND TELOMERASE-HEMMERN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS D'UTILISATION DE SURAMINE, DE POLYSULFATE PENTOSANE, D'ANTISENS DE TELOMERASE ET D'INHIBITEURS DE LA TELOMERASE

Publication

EP 1606302 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04706977 A

Priority

  • US 2004002609 W
  • US 44406103 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004070008A2] The invention provides methods and compositions for inhibiting telomerase activity and treatment of telomerase mediated conditions or diseases. The methods, compounds, and compositions of the invention may be employed alone, or in combination with other pharmacologically active agents, surgery, or radiation in the treatment of conditions or diseases mediated by telomerase activity, such as in the treatment of cancer.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/185 (2006.01); A61K 31/737 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C12N (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/737 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/185 (2013.01); C12N 15/1137 (2013.01); C12Y 207/07049 (2013.01); C12N 2310/11 (2013.01); C12N 2310/111 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] SKLAR GEOFFREY N ET AL: "Combined antitumor effect of suramin plus irradiation in human prostate cancer cells: The role of apoptosis", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 150, no. 5, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 1526 - 1532, XP009109244, ISSN: 0022-5347

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004070008 A2 20040819; WO 2004070008 A3 20050526; WO 2004070008 A8 20050929; AU 2004209428 A1 20040819; CA 2515000 A1 20040819; CN 1768075 A 20060503; EP 1606302 A2 20051221; EP 1606302 A4 20090218; JP 2007525414 A 20070906

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110309

2009-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091022

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090116

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 21/04 20060101AFI20050601BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 48/00 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/185 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/737 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/00 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2006-05-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK