Global Patent Index - EP 1606392 A4

EP 1606392 A4 2007-10-17 - NOVEL CBH1 HOMOLOGS AND VARIANT CBH1 CELLULASES

Title (en)

NOVEL CBH1 HOMOLOGS AND VARIANT CBH1 CELLULASES

Title (de)

NEUE CBH1-HOMOLOGE UND CBH1-CELLULASEVARIANTEN

Title (fr)

CELLULASES D'HOMOLOGUES CBH1 ET DE VARIANTS CBH1

Publication

EP 1606392 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04809323 A

Priority

  • US 2004008520 W
  • US 45636803 P
  • US 45869603 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7452707B2] Disclosed are a number of homologs and variants of Hypocrea jecorina Cel7A (formerly Trichoderma reesei cellobiohydrolase I or CBH1), nucleic acids encoding the same and methods for producing the same. The homologs and variant cellulases have the amino acid sequence of a glycosyl hydrolase of family 7A wherein one or more amino acid residues are substituted and/or deleted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Y 302/01091 (2013.01); C12N 9/2437 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 0104284 A1 20010118 - MIDWEST RESEARCH INST [US], et al
  • [PY] WO 2004016760 A2 20040226 - GENENCOR INT [US], et al
  • [A] DATABASE Geneseq [online] 30 November 1991 (1991-11-30), "Sequence encoded by cellobiohydrolase-I (CBHI) gene.", XP002437112, retrieved from EBI accession no. GSP:AAP50133 Database accession no. AAP50133 & EP 0137280 A1 19850417 - CETUS CORP [US]
  • [A] CHENG C ET AL: "Nucleotide sequence of the cellobiohydrolase gene from Trichoderma viride", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 18, no. 18, 1990, pages 5559, XP002274045, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [A] GOEDEGEBUUR FRITS ET AL: "Cloning and relational analysis of 15 novel fungal endoglucanases from family 12 glycosyl hydrolase", CURRENT GENETICS, vol. 41, no. 2, May 2002 (2002-05-01), pages 89 - 98, XP002436805, ISSN: 0172-8083
  • [A] COVERT S F ET AL: "STRUCTURE, ORGANIZATION AND TRANSCRIPTION OF A CELLOBIOHYDROLASE GENE", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, vol. 58, no. 7, July 1992 (1992-07-01), pages 2168 - 2175, XP002051406, ISSN: 0099-2240
  • [Y] GROSS LAURIE S ET AL: "Changing the properties of Hypocrea jecorina Cel7A (Trichoderma reesei CBH1) by single amino acid mutations", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, vol. 82, no. 1 Part 2, January 2002 (2002-01-01), & 46TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE BIOPHYSICAL SOCIETY; SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA; FEBRUARY 23-27, 2002, pages 459a, XP008079741, ISSN: 0006-3495
  • [Y] BECKER DIETER ET AL: "Engineering of a glycosidase Family 7 cellobiohydrolase to more alkaline pH optimum: The pH behaviour of Trichoderma reesei Cel7A and its E223S/A224H/L225V/T226A/D262G mutant", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, vol. 356, no. 1, 15 May 2001 (2001-05-15), pages 19 - 30, XP002447509, ISSN: 0264-6021

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2005054039 A1 20050310; US 7452707 B2 20081118; CA 2519760 A1 20050331; CA 2519760 C 20120522; CA 2770976 A1 20050331; CA 2770976 C 20150519; CN 1898381 A 20070117; CN 1898381 B 20130717; EP 1606392 A2 20051221; EP 1606392 A4 20071017; EP 2298876 A1 20110323; EP 2311942 A1 20110420; JP 2007534294 A 20071129; JP 2011152136 A 20110811; US 2009163397 A1 20090625; US 2011177561 A1 20110721; US 7951570 B2 20110531; US 8765440 B2 20140701; WO 2005028636 A2 20050331; WO 2005028636 A3 20060817; WO 2005028636 A8 20050506

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120505

2012-05-05 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080320

2007-10-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070917

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 9/42 20060101AFI20061123BHEP

2006-06-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK