Global Patent Index - EP 1608395 A4

EP 1608395 A4 2007-10-31 - ANTICANCER AGENT COMPRISING LK8 PROTEIN AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT

Title (en)

ANTICANCER AGENT COMPRISING LK8 PROTEIN AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT

Title (de)

ANTIKREBSMITTEL MIT LK8-PROTEIN ALS WIRKSTOFF

Title (fr)

AGENT ANTICANCEREUX COMPRENANT UNE PROTEINE LK8 EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF

Publication

EP 1608395 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04713257 A

Priority

  • KR 2004000357 W
  • KR 20030010797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004073730A1] The present invention relates to an anticancer agent comprising LK8 protein as an active ingredient. The anticancer agent of the present invention is effective to repress growth and metastasis of malignant tumor. Thus, the agent can be effectively used not only for repressor of cancer metastasis, but also for therapeutic agent of primary malignant tumor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/17; A61P 35/00; A61P 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1709 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] XUE S ET AL: "Apo(a) kringle V inhibits endothelial cell proliferation", FIBRINOLYSIS AND PROTEOLYSIS, vol. 14, no. Supplement 1, June 2000 (2000-06-01), & XVTH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON FIBRINOLYSIS AND PROTEOLYSIS; HAMAMATSU, JAPAN; JUNE 25-29, 2000, pages 35, XP008083595, ISSN: 1369-0191
  • [PX] KIM J-S ET AL: "Inhibition of angiogenesis and angiogenesis-dependent tumor growth by the cryptic kringle fragments of human apolipoprotein(a)", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 01 AUG 2003 UNITED STATES, vol. 278, no. 31, 1 August 2003 (2003-08-01), pages 29000 - 29008, XP002450345, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [PX] YU H-K ET AL: "Suppression of colorectal cancer liver metastasis and extension of survival by expression of apolipoprotein(a) kringles", CANCER RESEARCH 01 OCT 2004 UNITED STATES, vol. 64, no. 19, 1 October 2004 (2004-10-01), pages 7092 - 7098, XP002450346, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • [PX] KIM J-S ET AL: "Human apolipoprotein(a) kringle V inhibits angiogenesis in vitro and in vivo by interfering with the activation of focal adhesion kinases", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 313, no. 3, 16 January 2004 (2004-01-16), pages 534 - 540, XP004481590, ISSN: 0006-291X
  • See also references of WO 2004073730A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004073730 A1 20040902; AU 2004212856 A1 20040902; AU 2004212856 B2 20070719; BR PI0407611 A 20060214; CA 2516172 A1 20040902; CN 100546646 C 20091007; CN 1753685 A 20060329; EP 1608395 A1 20051228; EP 1608395 A4 20071031; JP 2006518342 A 20060810; KR 100595364 B1 20060703; KR 20040075270 A 20040827; RU 2005129273 A 20060310; RU 2306147 C2 20070920

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130903

2010-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100730

2007-10-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 38/17 20060101AFI20070919BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/04 20060101ALI20070919BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20070919BHEP

2006-06-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK