Global Patent Index - EP 1608876 B8

EP 1608876 B8 2007-10-03 - COOLANT PUMP, ESPECIALLY ELECTRIC CONVECTION-COOLED COOLANT PUMP WITH INTEGRATED DIRECTIONAL CONTROL VALVE, AND CORRESPONDING METHOD

Title (en)

COOLANT PUMP, ESPECIALLY ELECTRIC CONVECTION-COOLED COOLANT PUMP WITH INTEGRATED DIRECTIONAL CONTROL VALVE, AND CORRESPONDING METHOD

Title (de)

KÜHLMITTELPUMPE, INSBESONDERE STRÖMUNGSGEKÜHLTE ELEKTRISCHE KÜHLMITTELPUMPE MIT INTEGRIERTEM WEGEVENTIL, SOWIE VERFAHREN HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

POMPE DE FLUIDE REFRIGERANT, EN PARTICULIER, POMPE ELECTRIQUE A REFROIDISSEMENT HYDRAULIQUE, A DISTRIBUTEUR INTEGRE, ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1608876 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 04718939 A

Priority

  • EP 2004002455 W
  • DE 10314526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004088143A1] The invention relates to a coolant pump for a coolant circuit of the internal combustion engine of a motor vehicle, which comprises at least one cooling circuit and one bypass circuit. The coolant pump comprises a coolant pump housing (14) which is provided with an intake pipe (22), a bypass pipe (14) and a pressure pipe (34). A coolant pump electric motor (26) is arranged in the coolant pump housing (14) and drives a pump impeller (32) via a pump shaft (30). Its motor housing (28) is situated in the coolant flow. A directional control valve (40) is integrated into the coolant pump housing (14). The invention is characterized in that the intake pipe (22) is arranged in the area of the end of the pump motor facing away from the pump impeller (32). The bypass pipe is arranged in an area downstream of the intake pipe (22) and the pressure pipe (34) is arranged in an area downstream of the bypass pipe (24). Only the coolant that can be taken in by the cooler via the intake pipe is guided past the pump motor in a peripheral flow (50), especially through a flow channel (56) limited by the outer wall (52) of the pump motor housing (28) and the facing inner wall (54) of the pump housing and/or the facing inner wall (60) of the directional control valve (40). The invention also relates to a corresponding method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/426 (2013.01); F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F01P 7/16 (2013.01); F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 15/0016 (2013.01); F04D 29/5806 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); F05D 2270/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004088143 A1 20041014; AT 367532 T 20070815; DE 10314526 A1 20041021; DE 10314526 B4 20071129; DE 502004004367 D1 20070830; EP 1608876 A1 20051228; EP 1608876 B1 20070718; EP 1608876 B8 20071003; ES 2286621 T3 20071201; JP 2006522259 A 20060928; JP 4545143 B2 20100915; US 2006216166 A1 20060928; US 7334543 B2 20080226

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160311

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-04-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NIDEC GPM GMBH

- Effective date: 20160404

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-01-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: NIDEC GPM GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20151228

2016-01-29 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Effective date: 20151228

2015-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIDEC GPM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GERAETE- UND PUMPENBAU GMBH, 98673 MERBELSROD, DE

- Document: DE 502004004367

2015-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004004367

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2010-07-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080119

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080310

2010-05-05 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20091224

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080310

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2009-06-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GERATE- UND PUMPENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-06-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-05-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-05-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-05-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PIERBURG PUMP TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20080408

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071019

2008-03-05 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-02-29 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-01-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071218

2008-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2286621 T3

2007-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004004367 P 20070830

2007-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-08-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK