Global Patent Index - EP 1610056 B8

EP 1610056 B8 2009-02-25 - Connection device for detachably connecting a lamp

Title (en)

Connection device for detachably connecting a lamp

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung zum lösbaren Verbinden einer Lampe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion démontable pour une lampe

Publication

EP 1610056 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 05008301 A

Priority

DE 102004030109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1610056A1] The electrical bulb [10] of a headlight used on an automobile fits into a socket [8] and this is inserted into a holder [15] that fits into an adapter [4] and is spring loaded [14]. Contact elements [16] fit into the holder. Side contacts engage those of the bulb. An actuator element [17] controls access to the bulb.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 15/04 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/06 (2006.01); H01R 33/975 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/975 (2013.01); F21S 41/192 (2018.01); F21S 41/198 (2018.01); H01R 33/06 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1610056 A1 20051228; EP 1610056 B1 20081126; EP 1610056 B8 20090225; AT 415592 T 20081215; DE 102004030109 A1 20060119; DE 102004030109 B4 20060614; DE 502005006042 D1 20090108

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090415

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: YAZAKI EUROPE LTD.

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090226

2009-07-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090308

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006042 P 20090108

2008-12-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-12-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-12-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-28 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: DIE BENENNUNG CH/LI WURDE VOR ERTEILUNG ZURUECKGENOMMEN.

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060215

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU