Global Patent Index - EP 1610416 A3

EP 1610416 A3 2009-02-18 - Electrical device adapted to cooperate with a horizontal comb-shaped bus bar

Title (en)

Electrical device adapted to cooperate with a horizontal comb-shaped bus bar

Title (de)

Elektrisches Gerät angepast um mit einer kammförmigen Sammelschiene zusammenzuwirken

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique adapté à coopérer avec un peigne de répartition horizontale

Publication

EP 1610416 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 05291312 A

Priority

FR 0406729 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1610416A2] The device has a side (6) presenting craters (47, 55) situated at distance from orifices (12, 13) along left-right direction. The craters receive a tool for extraction of a horizontal distribution comb and are delimited by bottom surfaces (48, 56) and lateral surfaces (50, 52, 58, 60). The bottom surfaces are retreated relative to a base surface (45), and the lateral surfaces are situated between the bottom surfaces and base surface.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02B 1/20 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01); H01R 9/26 (2006.01); H01R 13/633 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/082 (2013.01); H01R 9/2675 (2013.01); H01R 13/633 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1610416 A2 20051228; EP 1610416 A3 20090218; EP 1610416 B1 20111214; AT 537590 T 20111215; CN 100568430 C 20091209; CN 1722324 A 20060118; FR 2871987 A1 20051223; FR 2871987 B1 20061208

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160620

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160620

2017-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 537590 T

- Effective date: 20160620

2017-02-08 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20130630

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LEGRAND FRANCE

- Effective date: 20130630

2013-01-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005031632

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120606

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-05-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-03-21 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-02-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005031632

- Effective date: 20120209

2011-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL PL

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL PL

2009-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090716

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02B 1/20 20060101AFI20090113BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 9/26 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND FRANCE

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIPARI, JEAN-PIERRE

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PUJOL, BRUNO

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU