Global Patent Index - EP 1614783 B1

EP 1614783 B1 2007-10-10 - Inductor core for a heatable galette

Title (en)

Inductor core for a heatable galette

Title (de)

Induktorkern für beheizbare Galette

Title (fr)

noyau d'inductance pour une galette à chauffer

Publication

EP 1614783 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04015841 A

Priority

EP 04015841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1614783A1] The device has several radial lamellas (11) in a star formation with radial sections (12) and with inner (13) and outer axial sections. The core has fixing arrangement in the form of latches, whereby the fixing arrangement is designed to fix the core lamellas at their radial sections to terminating plates (19,20) with surfaces complementary to the radial sections so that the lamellas are arranged between the plates : An independent claim is also included for a heatable galette.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2006.01); H05B 6/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 1/225 (2013.01); D02J 13/005 (2013.01); H05B 6/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1614783 A1 20060111; EP 1614783 B1 20071010; CN 100518417 C 20090722; CN 1719950 A 20060111; DE 502004005205 D1 20071122; JP 2006054169 A 20060223; JP 4039638 B2 20080130; KR 100698658 B1 20070323; KR 20060049766 A 20060519; TW 200615411 A 20060516; TW I294929 B 20080321; US 2006006978 A1 20060112; US 7170386 B2 20070130

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004005205

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20100705

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005205 P 20071122

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2007-10-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SSM SCHAERER SCHWEITER METTLER AG

2006-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2006-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060318

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK