Global Patent Index - EP 1614995 B8

EP 1614995 B8 2007-10-10 - Method of and system for generating and storing data required for dynamic route planning

Title (en)

Method of and system for generating and storing data required for dynamic route planning

Title (de)

Verfahren und Routenplanungssystem zur Generierung und Speicherung von für eine dynamische Routenplanung benötigten Daten

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de génération de données nécessaires pour une planification dynamique d'itinéraire

Publication

EP 1614995 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 05104929 A

Priority

DE 102004032499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1614995A1] Time profiles for different journeys may be plotted on a graph and may be corrected to give time factors or vectors (Stutzwert-Factoren). Two curves may be plotted with a nearly coincident (F1,F2). Maxima (max (D)) may be recorded. First and second normalization factors may be used. The system has a CPU connected to a data bank and a traffic information module. The system also includes an input module, a display and a RAM, also a clock and a GPS and a GSM module.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 21/34 (2006.01); G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/0968 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096844 (2013.01); G01C 21/3492 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1614995 A1 20060111; EP 1614995 B1 20070808; EP 1614995 B8 20071010; DE 102004032499 B3 20051208; DE 502005001167 D1 20070920

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130607

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130607

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-12-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111104

2010-10-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100930 AND 20101006

2008-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080509

2008-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2008-03-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070927

2007-09-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2007-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005001167 P 20070920

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-08-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051121

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU