EP 1615021 A1 20060111 - Hydrogen sensor and use thereof
Title (en)
Hydrogen sensor and use thereof
Title (de)
Wasserstoffsensor und dessen Verwendung
Title (fr)
Capteurd'hydrogène et son utilisation
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 102004033597 A 20040707
- US 65146604 P 20040826
Abstract (en)
An insulator layer (3) attaches to a semiconductor substrate (2). A fluoride ion conductor layer is applied to the insulator layer and a palladium layer/electrode (5) to the fluoride ion conductor layer (4). A second electrode (6) fits on the rear side of the semiconductor substrate. Independent claims are included for: (A) a hydrogen gas alarm with a hydrogen sensor; (B) and for a hydrogen gas detector with a hydrogen sensor; (C) and for a method for determining hydrogen gas concentration.
IPC 8 full level
G01N 27/22 (2006.01); G01N 27/414 (2006.01); G08B 17/117 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G08B 17/117 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 4088986 A 19780509 - BOUCHER CHARLES E
- US 5856780 A 19990105 - MCGEEHIN PETER [GB]
- US 6265222 B1 20010724 - DIMEO JR FRANK [US], et al
- US 6596236 B2 20030722 - DIMEO JR FRANK [US], et al
- APPL. PHYS. LETT., vol. 26, 1975, pages 55 - 57
- W. MORITZ, 54 ANNUAL MEETING OF THE INFERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ELECTROCHEMISTRY, 31 August 2003 (2003-08-31)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DD 294797 A5 19911010 - UNIV BERLIN HUMBOLDT [DE]
- [DY] US 5856780 A 19990105 - MCGEEHIN PETER [GB]
- [A] US 4795968 A 19890103 - MADOU MARC [US], et al
- [A] US 4836012 A 19890606 - DOTY MITCHELL E [US], et al
- [PA] MORITZ W ET AL: "All solid state room temperature hydrogen sensor", MEET. ABSTR.; MEETING ABSTRACTS; 2004 JOINT INTERNATIONAL MEETING - 206TH MEETING OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY/2004 FALL MEETING OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, MA 2004-02 2004, 2004, pages 2564, XP009055091
- [A] BARTHOLOMAUS L ET AL: "Semiconductor sensors for fluorine detection - optimization for low and high concentrations", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 65, no. 1-3, 30 June 2000 (2000-06-30), pages 270 - 272, XP004208656, ISSN: 0925-4005
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 125 (P - 691) 19 April 1988 (1988-04-19)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05090208 A 20050707