EP 1617872 A4 20110907 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ENHANCING IMMUNE RESPONSE
Title (en)
METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ENHANCING IMMUNE RESPONSE
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER IMMUNANTWORT
Title (fr)
PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE RENFORCER UNE REPONSE IMMUNE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2004011085 W 20040409
- US 46214003 P 20030410
- US 64090403 A 20030814
- US 51525603 P 20031029
- US 53370303 P 20031231
- US 54554204 P 20040218
- US 54542404 P 20040218
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2005001022A2] Methods and compositions for enhancing the immune response to an IRM compound by depositing within a localized tissue region an IRM depot preparation that provides an extended residence time of active IRM within the localized tissue region.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/06 (2006.01); A61F 2/24 (2006.01); A61F 2/76 (2006.01); A61K 47/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01)
IPC 8 main group level
C12N (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 47/543 (2017.07); A61K 47/6907 (2017.07); A61P 31/12 (2017.12); A61P 35/00 (2017.12); A61P 37/00 (2017.12); A61P 37/02 (2017.12); A61P 43/00 (2017.12)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] CN 1377648 A 20021106 - UNIV SICHUAN [CN]
- [XY] WO 9713499 A1 19970417 - UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]
- [XY] US 6273913 B1 20010814 - WRIGHT CAROL [US], et al
- [XY] EP 0386757 A2 19900912 - UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]
- [XY] WO 0246749 A2 20020613 - 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al
- [E] WO 2004060967 A1 20040722 - NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al
- [XY] US 5342940 A 19940830 - ONO KEIICHI [JP], et al
- [XY] WO 0040228 A2 20000713 - 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]
- [XY] HULAND EDITH ET AL: "In vivo system to detect long-term continuous release of bioactive interleukin-2 by immunopharmacological depot preparations in nude mice with human tumors", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, vol. 121, no. 5, 1995, pages 285 - 290, XP008140263, ISSN: 0171-5216
- [XY] MUI B ET AL: "Immune stimulation by a CpG-containing oligodeoxynucleotide is enhanced when encapsulated and delivered in lipid particles", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO, vol. 298, no. 3, 1 September 2001 (2001-09-01), pages 1185 - 1192, XP002228992, ISSN: 0022-3565
- [XY] ALEXIOU C ET AL: "LOCOREGIONAL CANCER TREATMENT WITH MAGNETIC DRUG TARGETING", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER REREARCH, US, vol. 60, no. 23, 1 December 2000 (2000-12-01), pages 6641 - 6648, XP001063184, ISSN: 0008-5472
- [XY] PACIOTTI G F ET AL: "Comparison of the toxicity and pharmacokinetics of neat and colloidal good bound TNF", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, vol. 40, 1 March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 585, XP001537146, ISSN: 0197-016X
- [Y] "The Merck Index, An encyclopedia of chemicals, drugs, and biologicals 13th Edition", 1 January 2001, MERCK & CO., INC, XP007914381
- [Y] LAMBERT D M: "Rationale and applications of lipids as prodrug carriers", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 11, no. S2, 1 January 2000 (2000-01-01), pages S15 - S27, XP002245016, ISSN: 0928-0987, DOI: 10.1016/S0928-0987(00)00161-5
- See references of WO 2005001022A2
Citation (examination)
- WO 2004032829 A2 20040422 - 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]
- WANG HUAN ET AL: "Comparison of Transdermal Diffusion in vitro of Imiquimod in Liposomes and Cream", ZHONGGUO YIYAO GONGYE ZAZHI - CHINESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICALS, SHANGHAI YIYAO GONGYE YANJIUYUAN, SHANGHAI, CN, vol. 34, no. 2, 1 February 2003 (2003-02-01), pages 73 - 75, XP008156372, ISSN: 1001-8255
- WANG HUAN ET AL: "Preparation Technology of Imiquimod Chitosan Nanoparticle Optimized by Orthogonal Test", ZHONGGUO YAOSHI - CHINA PHARMACIST, YAOWU LIUXINGBINGXUE ZAZHISHE, HUBEI, CN, vol. 5, no. 7, 1 July 2002 (2002-07-01), pages 432 - 433, XP008156371, ISSN: 1008-049X
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2005001022 A2 20050106; WO 2005001022 A3 20050915; AU 2004252409 A1 20050106; CA 2521662 A1 20050106; EP 1617872 A2 20060125; EP 1617872 A4 20110907; JP 2007514644 A 20070607
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2004011085 W 20040409; AU 2004252409 A 20040409; CA 2521662 A 20040409; EP 04775877 A 20040409; JP 2006532393 A 20040409