Global Patent Index - EP 1618824 B1

EP 1618824 B1 2007-10-31 - Domestic vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Domestic vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Haushaltsstaubsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur domestique

Publication

EP 1618824 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04425538 A

Priority

EP 04425538 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1618824A1] The present invention relates to a vacuum cleaner for domestic cleaning of the type comprising a body (2) adapted to comprise suction means (5) with suction connected to an air intake opening (8), filtering means (6A, 11) to filter the particles contained in the suctioned air, these filtering means (6A, 11) being interposed between the intake (8) and the suction means (5) and a tank (3, 3A) for a fluid (17) associated with the body (2). The vacuum cleaner has the characteristic feature that it comprises means (19, 22) for reducing the speed of the air discharged by the suction means (5) into the tank (3, 3A), these means (19, 22) for reducing the speed of the discharged air being in fluid communication with the suction means (5) via an air discharge path (7).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1608 (2013.01); A47L 9/182 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1618824 A1 20060125; EP 1618824 B1 20071031; DE 602004009782 D1 20071213; DE 602004009782 T2 20080828

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004009782

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130720

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120716

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009782 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050329

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK