Global Patent Index - EP 1619451 A1

EP 1619451 A1 20060125 - Humidifier

Title (en)

Humidifier

Title (de)

Luftbefeuchter

Title (fr)

Humidificateur

Publication

EP 1619451 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05015602 A

Priority

  • JP 2004213100 A
  • JP 2005058873 A

Abstract (en)

A humidifier comprises a humidifier body (2). A water tray housing section (2S) is formed in the humidifier body. A water tray (6) is detachably housed in the water tray housing section. A humidifying filter (7) is located in the water tray and at least partly immersed into water. A fan (8) is arranged to outward discharge air humidified through the humidifying filter. A pluraiity of electrodes (40A, 40B, 40C) are provided in the humidifier body and at least partly immersed into water in the water tray. An interlock mechanism (R) is operative to immerse the plurality of electrodes into water in the water tray when the water tray is housed in the water tray housing section and isolate the plurality of electrodes from water in the water tray when the water tray is drawn out of the water tray housing section.

IPC 8 full level

F24F 6/04 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

F24F 6/043 (2013.01); F24F 2006/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP 2003035443 A 20030207 - SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 2004045909 A1 20040311 - TOMIOKA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4663091 A 19870505 - SEO SUN K [KR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 06 3 June 2003 (2003-06-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 02 26 February 1999 (1999-02-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 10 10 October 2002 (2002-10-10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1619451 A1 20060125; EP 1619451 B1 20071003; DE 602005002689 D1 20071115; DE 602005002689 T2 20080619; JP 2006057995 A 20060302; JP 4549204 B2 20100922; KR 100626396 B1 20060920; KR 20060047543 A 20060518

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 05015602 A 20050719; DE 602005002689 T 20050719; JP 2005058873 A 20050303; KR 20050035119 A 20050427