Global Patent Index - EP 1619451 B1

EP 1619451 B1 2007-10-03 - Humidifier

Title (en)

Humidifier

Title (de)

Luftbefeuchter

Title (fr)

Humidificateur

Publication

EP 1619451 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05015602 A

Priority

  • JP 2004213100 A
  • JP 2005058873 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1619451A1] A humidifier comprises a humidifier body (2). A water tray housing section (2S) is formed in the humidifier body. A water tray (6) is detachably housed in the water tray housing section. A humidifying filter (7) is located in the water tray and at least partly immersed into water. A fan (8) is arranged to outward discharge air humidified through the humidifying filter. A pluraiity of electrodes (40A, 40B, 40C) are provided in the humidifier body and at least partly immersed into water in the water tray. An interlock mechanism (R) is operative to immerse the plurality of electrodes into water in the water tray when the water tray is housed in the water tray housing section and isolate the plurality of electrodes from water in the water tray when the water tray is drawn out of the water tray housing section.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 6/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 6/043 (2013.01); F24F 2006/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1619451 A1 20060125; EP 1619451 B1 20071003; DE 602005002689 D1 20071115; DE 602005002689 T2 20080619; JP 2006057995 A 20060302; JP 4549204 B2 20100922; KR 100626396 B1 20060920; KR 20060047543 A 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140720

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005002689

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140719

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005002689

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005002689 P 20071115

2007-10-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2007-10-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

2007-10-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANYO AIR-CONDITIONERS CO., LTD.

2006-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2006-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060325

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU