EP 1620126 A4 20070704 - DISEASE PREVENTION AND VACCINATION PRIOR TO THYMIC REACTIVATIONS
Title (en)
DISEASE PREVENTION AND VACCINATION PRIOR TO THYMIC REACTIVATIONS
Title (de)
PRÄVENTION VON ERKRANKUNGEN UND VAKZINATION VOR THYMUS-REAKTIVIERUNGEN
Title (fr)
PREVENTION DE MALADIES ET VACCINATION AVANT REACTIVATION THYMIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2004011921 W 20040419
- US 41906803 A 20030418
- US 41906603 A 20030418
- US 41872703 A 20030418
- US 41874703 A 20030418
- US 52700103 P 20031205
- US 74883103 A 20031230
- US 74912203 A 20031230
- US 74911803 A 20031230
- US 74845003 A 20031230
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2004094599A2] The present disclosure provides methods for preventing or treating illness, improving responsiveness to immunization, and improving the efficacy of gene therapy in a patient, by disrupting sex steroid mediated signaling and reactivating the patient's thymus. In some embodiments, the patient's thymus is reactivated by interruption or ablation of sex steroid mediated signaling by the administration of LHRH agonists, LHRH antagonists, anti-LHRH receptor antibodies, anti-LHRH vaccines, anti-androgens, anti-estrogens, selective estrogen receptor modulators (SERMs), selective androgen receptor modulators (SARMs), selective progesterone response modulators (SPRMs), ERDs, aromatase inhibitors, or various combinations thereof.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A01N 25/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 35/26 (2006.01); A61K 35/28 (2015.01); A61K 35/36 (2015.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/20 (2006.01); A61K 39/38 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C12N 5/02 (2006.01); F22B 7/04 (2006.01)
IPC 8 main group level
CPC (source: EP KR)
A61K 31/00 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 35/26 (2013.01 - KR); A61K 35/28 (2013.01 - EP KR); A61K 35/36 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 38/09 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 38/18 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 38/1825 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 38/193 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 38/20 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 39/00 (2013.01 - EP KR); A61K 39/461 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/4615 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/4621 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/4622 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/46433 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/46434 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/46447 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/464493 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/464714 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/464817 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/464838 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 39/464839 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 45/06 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 48/0083 (2013.01 - EP); A61P 5/28 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 5/32 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 5/36 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 5/38 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 5/42 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 7/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/04 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/10 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/12 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/16 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/18 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/22 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 33/02 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 33/10 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 37/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 37/04 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 37/06 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 37/08 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 43/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61K 2239/31 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 2239/38 (2023.05 - EP KR); A61K 2239/59 (2023.05 - EP KR); Y02A 50/30 (2018.01 - EP)
C-Set (source: EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] WO 0230259 A2 20020418 - BOYD RICHARD [AU]
- [E] WO 2004094988 A2 20041104 - NORWOOD IMMUNOLOGY LTD [AU], et al & BLOOD, vol. 100, no. 11, 16 November 2002 (2002-11-16), 44TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY; PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA; DECEMBER 06-10, 2002, pages Abstract No. 1578, ISSN: 0006-4971 & BLOOD, vol. 102, no. 11, 16 November 2003 (2003-11-16), 45TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 06-09, 2003, pages 527a, ISSN: 0006-4971
- [X] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 16 November 2002 (2002-11-16), GOLDBERG GABRIELLE L ET AL: "Sex Steroid Ablation Enhances Immune Reconstitution Following Allogeneic Bone Marrow Transplantation.", XP002431952, Database accession no. PREV200300336178
- [PX] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 16 November 2003 (2003-11-16), SUTHERLAND JAYNE S ET AL: "Sex steroid ablation therapy enhances hemopoiesis and lymphopoiesis following allogeneic and autologous peripheral blood stem cell transplantation.", XP002431953, Database accession no. PREV200400147250
Citation (examination)
- LIPSCOMB H.L.; SHARP J.G.: "Alterations in bone-marrow following thymectomy in rats", EXPERIENTIA, vol. 35, 1979, pages 1401 - 1402, XP008086456
- VISELLI S.M. ET AL: "Androgens Alter B Cell Development in Normal Mice", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 182, no. 2, 15 December 1997 (1997-12-15), pages 99 - 104
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2004094599 A2 20041104; WO 2004094599 A3 20051229; AU 2004241949 A1 20041202; CA 2528521 A1 20041202; EP 1620126 A2 20060201; EP 1620126 A4 20070704; EP 1620545 A2 20060201; EP 1620545 A4 20070704; JP 2007518699 A 20070712; KR 20060022232 A 20060309; WO 2004103271 A2 20041202; WO 2004103271 A3 20051124
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2004011913 W 20040419; AU 2004241949 A 20040419; CA 2528521 A 20040419; EP 04759971 A 20040419; EP 04785486 A 20040419; JP 2006532426 A 20040419; KR 20057019858 A 20051018; US 2004011921 W 20040419