Global Patent Index - EP 1620626 B1

EP 1620626 B1 2007-10-17 - HYDROMECHANICAL CLOSING SEQUENCE CONTROLLER

Title (en)

HYDROMECHANICAL CLOSING SEQUENCE CONTROLLER

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCH-MECHANISCHE SCHLIESSFOLGERELUNG

Title (fr)

SEQUENCE DE FERMETURE MECANO-HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1620626 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04700976 A

Priority

  • EP 2004000092 W
  • DE 10300643 A
  • DE 10361085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004063508A1] The invention relates to a hydromechanical closing sequence controller for double-leaf doors, comprising a fixed leaf and a moving leaf, whereby both the fixed leaf and the moving leaf are each operated by a hydraulic action door closer (1, 2), each of which is provided with an axis (3). According to the invention, a hydromechanical closing sequence controller which guarantees a secure closing sequence which is achieved with the least possible number of components of simple construction can be achieved, whereby a cam wheel (5) is arranged on the axis of the door closer for the fixed leaf, cooperating with a valve (7) which controls the door closer of the moving leaf, or a slide piece on the fixed leaf cooperates with the valve (7) which controls the door closer on the moving leaf.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/00 (2006.01); E05F 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 5/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004063508 A1 20040729; AT 376113 T 20071115; DE 502004005267 D1 20071129; DK 1620626 T3 20080225; EP 1620626 A1 20060201; EP 1620626 B1 20071017; EP 1620626 B2 20170301; ES 2295813 T3 20080416

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMAKABA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 502004005267

2017-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004005267

- Representative's name: BALDER IP LAW, S.L., ES

2017-03-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-03-01 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502004005267

2017-03-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DORMAKABA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150109

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004005267

- Representative's name: BALDER IP LAW, S.L., ES

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 502004005267

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMAKABA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 502004005267

- Effective date: 20141210

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100109

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100110

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100110

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-10-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG

- Free text: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG#DORMA PLATZ 1#58256 ENNEPETAL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DORMA GMBH + CO. KG#DORMA PLATZ 1#58256 ENNEPETAL (DE)

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100109

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG;DORMA PLATZ 1;58256 ENNEPETAL (DE)

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100109

2010-09-13 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080418

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080109

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080109

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080118

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-08-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-08-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-08-29 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-08-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GEZE GMBH

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DORMA G.M.B.H. + CO. KG

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-05-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080317

2008-05-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295813 T3

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-02-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-01-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2008-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071217

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005267 P 20071129

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHWEITZER, FALKO

2006-04-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051129

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR