EP 1621645 A1 20060201 - Steel sheet with hot dip galvanized zinc alloy coating
Title (en)
Steel sheet with hot dip galvanized zinc alloy coating
Title (de)
Legiertes heissgetauchtes galvanisiertes Stahlband
Title (fr)
Feuille d'acier galvanisé à chaud recouverte de zinc allié.
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 04077168 A 20040728
Abstract (en)
Steel strip provided with a hot dip galvanized zinc alloy coating layer, in which the coating of the steel strip is carried out in a bath of molten zinc alloy, the zinc alloy in the coating consisting of: 0.3 - 2.3 weight % magnesium; 0.6 - 2.3 weight % aluminium; optional < 0.2 weight % of one or more additional elements; unavoidable impurities; the remainder being zinc.
IPC 8 full level
C23C 2/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C23C 2/06 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0594520 A1 19940427 - LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]
- [X] GB 2110248 A 19830615 - NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 02 5 February 2003 (2003-02-05)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 09 3 September 2003 (2003-09-03)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 04 2 April 2003 (2003-04-02)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 05 14 September 2000 (2000-09-14)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
- [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 200272, Derwent World Patents Index; Class M13, AN 2002-672516, XP002309447
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04077168 A 20040728